AXIS COUNSELLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Therapeutic counselling of adult survivors of childhood sexual abuse (CSA). Also the counselling of: - Partners and relatives of survivors of CSA - People who have suffered sexual attack or trauma Therapeutic and relationship counselling Provision of information and training The offering of indepentent advice and support to victims of rape and sexual violence
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,496,657
Donations and legacies | £1.49m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £10.31k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,395,323
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.40m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.40m | |
Retained for future use | £101.33k |
People

40 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 24 March 1999: Standard registration
- AXIS COUNSELLING-APT (Working name)
- AXIS COUNSELLING-LINK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Bryans | Chair | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Eatough | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas George Orwin Burn | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tereza Hayek | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Bruce Goode | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Davina Lyn Ploszay | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £693.08k | £1.03m | £1.26m | £1.42m | £1.50m | |
|
Total expenditure | £705.68k | £937.93k | £1.07m | £1.25m | £1.40m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £294.05k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £12.71k | £1.03m | £1.26m | £1.41m | £1.49m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.38m | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.18k | £892 | £395 | £3.28k | £10.31k | |
|
Income - Other | £679.18k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £27.43k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £694.51k | £937.93k | £1.07m | £1.25m | £1.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £11.64k | £0 | £37.15k | £15.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £11.17k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £22.23k | £42.26k | £76.01k | £55.38k | £48.40k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £892 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £174.22k | £233.34k | £430.76k | £578.91k | £714.91k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £14.89k | £4.12k | £43.33k | £0 | £27.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JULY 1996. CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAMES DATED 4 FEBRUARY 1997 AND 30 SEPTEMBER 1998 as amended on 05 Aug 2019 as amended on 26 Sep 2022 as amended on 05 Oct 2022 as amended on 26 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
2.1 The Charity's objects are restricted specifically, in each case only for the public benefit to: 2.1.1 Preserve and protect the health, and reduce the needs, distress and trauma of, any adult or child over the age of 5 years (or their partner, carer or relative) who has experienced any form of sexual abuse or violence, at any time in their life, through the provision of counselling, information, advocacy, support and practical help, where necessary; 2.1.2 Advance the education of the public and of professionals, in the subject of rape and sexual abuse, and raise awareness of the impacts of rape and sexual abuse, whether physical, medical, psychological, or social; 2.1.3 Provide talking therapy to people in any form of institution who have suffered from any form of sexual abuse or violence at any time in their life, including but not restricted to prisons or educational establishments; Nothing in these Articles shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with any statutory provision regarding the meaning of the word "charitable" or the words "charitable purposes" in force in any part of the United Kingdom.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Axis Counselling
Fletcher House
15 College Hill
SHREWSBURY
SY1 1LY
- Phone:
- 01743357777
- Email:
- info@axiscounselling.org.uk
- Website:
-
axiscounselling.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window