Brighton Alliance Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities include regular Sunday worship, fellowship, Bible studies, prayer meetings, young adults fellowship, outreach, Evangelism, Spiritual counselling for family problems & gambling/alcohol/drug habits. We aim to encourage new members of the congregation & to serve the local community. In Sep 17 we became an associate member of the CACU (UK) for increased support & diversity of speakers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 April 2000: Standard registration
- BRIGHTON CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miu Yee Leung | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sai Chung Chu | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Siu Yuk Ma | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wing Sze Cheung | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suk Ching Tong | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mei Po Mabel Tong | Trustee | 08 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kwok Fai Wong | Trustee | 08 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gloria LY PORTER | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.92k | £6.53k | £13.40k | £20.60k | £28.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.98k | £6.20k | £10.11k | £10.43k | £13.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 19TH MARCH 2000 as amended on 25 Sep 2022 as amended on 25 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN SESSEX AND ADJOINING AREAS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG CHINESE PEOPLE BY PREACHING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND BY ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL AND EVANGELICAL BASIS HEREINAFTER STATED AND IN SO DOING TO PROMOTE EARNEST CHRISTIAN LIVING AMONG THE MEMBER SOF THE CHURCH IN SERVING JESUS CHRIST AND PROMOTE THE WORLD-WIDE MISSION OF JESUS CHRIST.
Area of benefit
SUSSEX AND ADJOINING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Ring Road
LANCING
BN15 0QE
- Phone:
- 01903297355
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window