TWINS TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The following principal activities and services contribute to the achievement of our objectives; the provision of a telephone helpline, practical help in the home, classes, publications, clinical research, quarterly magazine, website, campaigning on issues that impact on the multiple birth community, specialist support groups, events, and links with local clubs and related organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,209,189
Donations and legacies | £253.86k | |
Charitable activities | £796.01k | |
Other trading activities | £135.26k | |
Investments | £24.06k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,188,924
Raising funds | £13.47k | |
Charitable activities | £1.18m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £24,796 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £13.47k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.18m | |
Retained for future use | £20.27k |
People

28 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 July 1999: Standard registration
- TAMBA, TWINS & MULTIPLE BIRTHS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Berney-Edwards | Chair | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bartholomew Terence Quinton Smith | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanda Sarah Norman | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dominic John Cashman | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rajmeet Kaur Bhatti | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Riches | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Laura Rathbone | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Marie Ramsay | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Butler | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Surabhi Nanda | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.15m | £1.21m | £1.18m | £1.19m | £1.21m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13m | £1.11m | £1.14m | £1.21m | £1.19m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.76k | £49.08k | £37.81k | £33.05k | £24.80k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £269.86k | £222.23k | £262.37k | £295.40k | £253.86k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £105.10k | £140.41k | £136.64k | £131.82k | £135.26k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £767.66k | £844.52k | £773.93k | £749.77k | £796.01k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.79k | £2.05k | £2.99k | £12.08k | £24.06k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.12m | £1.10m | £1.13m | £1.19m | £1.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £12.83k | £13.27k | £18.35k | £19.49k | £13.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.51k | £8.62k | £9.44k | £8.98k | £9.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £21.33k | £33.33k | £33.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £135.28k | £114.16k | £91.29k | £58.53k | £25.67k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £563.88k | £700.31k | £730.06k | £688.68k | £737.04k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £216.22k | £230.83k | £205.54k | £155.26k | £150.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/12/2014 as amended on 01 Oct 2019 as amended on 01 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING PERSONS ENGAGED IN MEDICAL, EDUCATIONAL OR WELFARE PROFESSIONS, ABOUT THE INCIDENCE AND EFFECTS OF MULTIPLE BIRTHS AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, WELFARE AND DEVELOPMENT OF TWINS AND HIGHER MULTIPLES; (B) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND PROMOTE THE GENERAL WELFARE OF TWINS AND HIGHER MULTIPLES, INCLUDING THOSE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; (C) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH (BOTH PHYSICAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL) OF THE PARENTS OF TWINS OR HIGHER MULTIPLES, WITH SPECIAL REGARD TO THE HEALTH OF WOMEN WHO ARE EXPECTING MULTIPLE BIRTHS OR WHO HAVE GIVEN BIRTH TO TWINS OR HIGHER MULTIPLES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 7.02
Crown House
One Crown Square
Church Street East
Woking
GU21 6HR
- Phone:
- 01252332344
- Email:
- enquiries@twinstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window