WHITE CLOSE SLAPTON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains a public open space for nature conservation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 15 April 1999: Standard registration
- SLAPTON VILLAGE FIELD (Working name)
- WHITE CLOSE FIELD / WCST (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Michael Naish | Chair | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dendy Ticehurst | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Kalisher | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Louis Carter | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dave Collier | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sian Cairney | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tony Barton | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Mary Blomeley | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.65k | £3.34k | £4.92k | £1.36k | £518 | |
|
Total expenditure | £279 | £2.90k | £4.74k | £1.03k | £157 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO THE PROVISION OF THE PROPERTY AND SHALL ACCORDINGLY HOLD ANY PROPERTY TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS 'WHITE CLOSE, SLAPTON,' FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION, PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN SLAPTON, DEVON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carlane Court
Slapton
KINGSBRIDGE
Devon
TQ7 2PT
- Phone:
- 07855967452
- Email:
- white.close.trust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window