Financial history SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF ALTRINCHAM AND SALE

Charity number: 1073375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.14k £32.95k £33.46k £21.67k £25.95k
Total expenditure £30.57k £30.08k £32.74k £24.01k £19.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A