THE GATEWAY (WARRINGTON) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Gateway is home to and provides a central focus for a number of local voluntary, community and statutory organisations and services to come and work together to help people in the local community. The Gateway is the ideal venue for hosting meetings, conferences, training events, photographic displays, art exhibitions and cultural events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warrington
Governance
- 16 March 2000: Standard registration
- THE GATEWAY (Working name)
- WARRINGTON COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN PAUL CULLEN | Chair |
|
||||||
Thomas Michael Jennings | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Cummins | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS PIP HORNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.17k | £248.41k | £243.41k | £250.12k | £277.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.74k | £181.31k | £248.32k | £273.52k | £308.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £4.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMO AND ARTS OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 JANUARY 2000 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Gateway
85 Sankey Street
Warrington
WA1 1SR
- Phone:
- 01925246801
- Email:
- lynneb@thegateway.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window