KOKNI COMMUNITY LUTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the religion of Islam according to the doctrines and beliefs of the Shaif Madhab To advance the education of the public in Luton and surrounding district in particular Kokni Muslim children and adults ("the beneficial class") which includes healthly living. To relieve poverty, distress and sickness of the beneficial class To provide facilities for recreation and leisure time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Luton
Governance
- 16 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nihaad Kapadi | Chair | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sultan Ahmed Parkar | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Altaf Jasnaik | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kaysh Kazi | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aleem Modak | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lubna Zahir Rajiwate | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nikhat Parkar | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hishamuddin Parkar | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sadaf Mhatay | Trustee | 10 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
FAIZ PARKAR | Trustee | 10 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Faiz Parkar | Trustee | 10 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.74k | £57.14k | £73.77k | £90.64k | £136.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.44k | £29.07k | £70.52k | £84.75k | £138.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH DECEMBER 1999 AND AMENDED 11 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE DOCTRINES AND BELIEF OF THE SHAFI MZAAB. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN LUTON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT IN PARTICULAR KOKNI MUSLIM CHILDREN AND ADULTS. 3. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS OF THE BENEFICIAL CLASS. 4. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE EFFECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
LUTON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kokni Community Luton Centre
Unit 1-3
Bury Park Industrial Park
Bury Park Road
LUTON
LU1 1HB
- Phone:
- 07932859058
- Email:
- admin@kokniluton.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window