LONDON LUNG CANCER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises and sponsors research into treatment of lung cancer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 April 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ROBIN RUDD | Trustee | 22 December 1998 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIOW MING LEE PHD MD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Spiro | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £651 | £280 | £12 | £17 | £674 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.77k | £485 | £53.34k | £482 | £482 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 DECEMBER 1998, SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 12 MARCH 1999.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF LUNG (INCLUDING PLEURAL) CANCER PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATED.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 NEW CAVENDISH STREET
LONDON
W1G 8TQ
- Phone:
- 02074863247
- Email:
- dr@robinrudd.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window