FRIENDS OF ST. EDMUND'S CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The restoration, preservation, repair, maintenance, beautification and reconstruction of the fabric of St Edmund's Church, Old Costessey, Norfolk 2. To provide or assist in the provision of facilities for leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare with the object of improving the conditions of life of the inhabitants of the area of benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 May 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENIS ANDREW COLLEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Judith Violet May Collen | Trustee | 11 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Elizabeth Lister | Trustee | 11 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Paul Hill | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Nicholas Lusher | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jonathan Piesse | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Rozelle Platt | Trustee | 29 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
AVERIL GEMMELL BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.54k | £150 | £2.70k | £1.22k | £5.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.77k | £1.14k | £12.10k | £2.36k | £15.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH NOVEMBER 1998, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 19TH APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
(A) THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST.EDMUND'S AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
OLD COSTESSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 West End
Costessey
Norwich
NR8 5AG
- Phone:
- 01603744477
- Email:
- averilgb@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window