Financial history TELECOMMUNICATIONS EASTERN EUROPEAN CHALLENGE

Charity number: 1074765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 13/11/2019 13/11/2020 13/11/2021 13/11/2022 13/11/2023
Total gross income £39.03k £34.23k £38.37k £116.68k £58.18k
Total expenditure £24.69k £24.13k £44.11k £126.65k £78.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A