Financial history THE DULCIE MAYNE STEPHENS ART TRUST

Charity Number: 1074927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £875 £825 £848 £1.72k £918
Total expenditure £1.80k £0 £250 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A