HURST COMMUNITY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise money by the retail sale of donated goods. Then to distribute half the profits for the development of Holy Trinity Church, Hurstpierpoint and an equal amount to Local causes and projects for the benefit of the residents of Hurstpierpoint, Albourne and Sayers Common.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 24 August 1999: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE HURST COMMUNITY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- HURST COMMUNITY CHARITY SHOP (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Leech | Chair | 31 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jill Manning | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia May Johns | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Portas | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Rosemary Brown | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Douglas McKemey | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.74k | £24.72k | £37.76k | £58.53k | £63.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.68k | £50.85k | £54.85k | £43.92k | £39.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.57k | £9.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 March 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 March 2024 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 November 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 November 2020 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 13TH OCTOBER 1998, AMENDED ON THE 14TH JULY 1999.
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL AND CIVIL PARISHES OF HURSTPIERPOINT AND ALBOURNE. 2. FOR SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL AT THEIR DISCRETION DECIDE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Area of benefit
HURSTPIERPOINT AND ALBOURNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHANTRY STABLES
HIGH STREET
HURSTPIERPOINT
HASSOCKS
WEST SUSSEX
BN6 9RE
- Phone:
- 01273831233
- Email:
- timjleech@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window