SOUTH LONDON RESOURCE CENTRE FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE (BUILDING FOR SIGHT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The South London Resource Centre for Visually Impaired People works in collaboration with the Eye Department at St Thomas' Hospital, London, to provide the optometric Low Vision service for Guys and St Thomas' NHS Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 04 January 2000: Standard registration
- BUILDING FOR SIGHT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PARUL PATEL | Chair | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Shilling | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
MAREK PETER KARAS | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE DE COURCY | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD WAITE-ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SARAH JANIKOUN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.02k | £2.87k | £1.01k | £130 | £240 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.86k | £1.36k | £2.96k | £3.07k | £4.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED RESIDENTS OF THE SOUTH LONDON BOROUGHS OF LAMBETH, SOUTHWARK AND WANDSWORTH BY PROVIDING A RESOURCE CENTRE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
LAMBETH, LEWISHAM, SOUTHWARK AND WANDSWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHANDELLE
14 PADDOCK FIELDS
OLD BASING
BASINGSTOKE
RG24 7DB
- Phone:
- 01256362800
- Email:
- ewaiteroberts@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window