The Foundations Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundations Trust provides support and oversight for a range of connected projects based from the twelfth-century Round Church in the centre of Cambridge, exploring the relationship between Christianity and culture. These include Christian Heritage which runs the Round Church Visitor Centre and the Cambridge Christian Study Centre through which the charity also supports university ministry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 27 July 1999: Standard registration
- CAMBRIDGE SUMMER SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY (Previous name)
- CHRISTIAN HERITAGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXANDER LINDSAY MCILHINNEY | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Lindsay Brown | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Professor John Carson Lennox | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy Laurence | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev RANALD MACAULAY MA CANTAB BD HONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £308.53k | £149.87k | £173.22k | £263.17k | £258.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £276.87k | £172.08k | £162.61k | £200.81k | £280.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £52.61k | £30.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/12/1998 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/11/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/07/2014 as amended on 29 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND PROMOTE CHRISTIAN THEOLOGY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BIBLE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Foundations Trust
The Round Church
Bridge Street
Cambridge
CB2 1UB
- Phone:
- 01223 311602
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window