Financial history UPTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1073783
Charity reporting is up to date (268 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/09/2019 15/09/2020 15/09/2021 15/09/2022 15/09/2023
Total gross income £14.53k £8.19k £528 £4.77k £14.62k
Total expenditure £18.52k £8.61k £2.34k £1.46k £8.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A