THE FRIENDS OF SAWLEY INFANT/NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1078010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raffles, summer fayres and cake stalls.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £7,067
Total expenditure: £8,785

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 November 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kirsty Oakden Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Lucy Fleet Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Jenny Perreau Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Rebecca Morley Trustee 01 September 2011
None on record
WENDY CROWDER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.97k £5.13k £2.87k £5.21k £7.07k
Total expenditure £1.62k £6.54k £4.84k £4.63k £8.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 March 2022 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 March 2021 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SAWLEY INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL
WILMOT STREET
LONG EATON
NOTTINGHAM
NG10 3DQ
Phone:
01159732652