Financial history THE ANCHOR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1082485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £253.11k £199.08k £205.31k £234.50k £226.98k
Total expenditure £287.13k £283.95k £287.60k £325.05k £352.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A