THE FRANCHE RIDING GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Franche Riding Group supports a group of local children with a wide range of disabilities to go horse riding. Horse riding offers these special children an opportunity for enjoyment, challenge, friendship, laughter, achievement, independence and confidence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 27 January 1999: Standard registration
- FRANCHE RIDING GROUP (Previous name)
- LEA CASTLE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Funnell | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paula Woodward | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Cross | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Irene Crow | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Gallacher | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £491 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.46k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE-DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE WORCESTERSHIRE AREA
Area of benefit
WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Franche Primary School
Chestnut Grove
KIDDERMINSTER
Worcestershire
DY11 5QB
- Phone:
- 01562 751788
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window