NEW LODGE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide disabled people with the opportunity to go horse riding in order to benefit their health and well being. We are dedicated to improving the lives of people with disabilities through the provision of opportunities for horse riding. Our aim is to use riding as a therapy to help benefit people of all ages with a wide range of disabilities both physical and intellectual.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,945 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 27 January 1999: Standard registration
- NEW LODGE RDA (Working name)
- NEW LODGE RDA GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOROTHY JOHNSON | Chair | 29 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jayne Amelia Green | Trustee | 05 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
HILARY CRAWFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.69k | £41.51k | £32.98k | £29.74k | £18.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.24k | £36.28k | £36.58k | £37.58k | £19.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.44k | £12.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | £15.25k | £15.25k | £4.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE-DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE SOUTH EAST LONDON AREA
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Lodge Centre
Mottingham Lane
Eltham
London
SE9 4RW
- Phone:
- 02088516447
- Email:
- newlodgerda@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window