Financial history SUTTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1074710
Charity reporting is overdue by 1038 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £73.33k £56.13k £64.29k £71.39k £62.83k
Total expenditure £78.17k £76.87k £63.43k £61.90k £65.54k
Income from government contracts £54.68k £41.06k £48.60k £52.20k £52.38k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £534