CANOLFAN OWAIN GLYNDWR CYF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MUSEUM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 08 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhiain Rhys Bebb | Chair | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
EINION VAUGHAN JONES | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Llion Dwyfor Pughe | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.53k | £35.06k | £56.73k | £50.53k | £46.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.07k | £35.23k | £51.76k | £49.24k | £35.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.47k | £36.02k | £16.30k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 December 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 December 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF MACHYNLLETH (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USES FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, INCLUDING THE DEVELOPMENT AND USE OF THE OLD PARLIAMENT BUILDING (PART OF THE OWAIN GLYNDWR CENTRE) AS AN HISTORICAL INTERPRETIVE CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Area of benefit
MACHYNLLETH
Linked charities
- 08 November 1999 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canolfan Owain Glyndwr
Heol Maengwyn
MACHYNLLETH
SY20 8EE
- Phone:
- 01654702932
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window