COLWINSTON COMMUNITY HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide community facilities and support to the villagers of Colwinston and surrounding villages
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £3,806 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 12 February 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Frost | Chair | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Flux | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Conway Hawkins | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.88k | £18.00k | £15.89k | £12.38k | £16.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.12k | £16.33k | £5.21k | £16.59k | £22.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.40k | £14.33k | £150 | £3.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 July 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 September 2020 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 September 2020 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COLWINSTON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE COLWINSTON COMMUNITY COUNCIL WARD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
COLWINSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Heol Cae Pwll
Colwinston
COWBRIDGE
Vale of Glamorgan
CF71 7PL
- Phone:
- 07484646604
- Email:
- bobgatis@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window