ABERCONWY RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a safe supervised opportunity for people with physical and mental disabilities to horseride. it is available for people of all ages and most disabilities with suitably qualified staff and trained volunteers in attendance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Conwy
Governance
- 29 January 1999: Standard registration
- 03 May 2012: Funds received from 1074182 GOGARTH TUESDAY GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSO...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerri Rockey | Chair | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ruth | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Roberts | Trustee | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Moore | Trustee | 09 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jillian John | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Futyan | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
HUGH KRAAIJEVELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.69k | £66 | £550 | £675 | £170 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.10k | £1.32k | £601 | £864 | £713 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE-DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE CONWY COUNTY BOROUGH AND PART OF DENBIGHSHIRE
Area of benefit
CONWY COUNTY BOROUGH AND PART OF DENBIGHSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRYN GLORIAN
LLANRWST ROAD
CONWY
LL32 8HZ
- Phone:
- 07968590468
- Email:
- lizzrees@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window