Accounts and annual returns ANYADWE CHILDREN AND FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1076711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 January 2025 348 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 July 2023 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 April 2021 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required