Trustees SOUTH WEST CORNWALL RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1073713

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Anne Doggett | Chair | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Bernard Carr | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Judith Christine Carr | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Williams | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Elizabeth Antonini | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jade Lauren Booton | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trudi Anna Pitts | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marian P Owen | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE RIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jill Yelling | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET OLIVE SHEARN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.