THE GUILDFORD CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local choir - puts on concerts, proceeds from which support local and sometimes national charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Emma Clare Humphreys | Chair | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Joseph Arthur | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Eleanor Makower | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Couldery | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.21k | £5.29k | £16.10k | £20.20k | £19.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.84k | £5.39k | £15.68k | £15.39k | £14.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 5TH AUGUST 1997 AND AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION PASSED ON 22ND OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED ON 10 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED ON 04 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Agraria Road
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU2 4LF
- Phone:
- 01483 761776
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window