FORMBY AND SOUTHPORT RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A group which exists to improve the lives of people with disabilities through the provision of horse riding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sefton
Governance
- 19 February 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA MARGARET MARKS | Chair |
|
||||
Janet Wilkinson | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|||
Lynette Marsden | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|||
JANET Elaine BIRD | Trustee |
|
||||
KAREN SOUTHERAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.69k | £2.75k | £4.83k | £10.03k | £8.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.55k | £2.94k | £2.69k | £7.40k | £7.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 23RD NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE FORMBY AND SOUTHPORT AREA
Area of benefit
FORMBY AND SOUTHPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Paradise Lane
Formby
LIVERPOOL
L37 7EJ
- Phone:
- 01704 873088
- Email:
- FandSRDA@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window