Financial history ELHAP

Charity number: 1077508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £923.39k £758.28k £663.02k £689.17k £874.93k
Total expenditure £918.18k £677.41k £701.01k £736.60k £885.21k
Income from government contracts £651.71k £303.08k £135.85k £276.17k £344.32k
Income from government grants N/A £234.25k £39.10k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £267.59k £249.64k £212.61k £238.49k £319.81k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £651.71k £303.08k £409.77k £447.58k £550.22k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £181 £82 £27 £778 £2.69k
Income - Other £3.91k £205.48k £40.61k £2.32k £2.21k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £857.66k £652.66k £701.01k £707.31k £837.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £60.52k £24.75k £0 £29.29k £47.47k
Expenditure - Governance £9.56k £10.72k £17.89k £19.03k £32.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0