COBBES MEADOW RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides riding and carriage-driving activities for disabled individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
135 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 22 February 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas David Owen HALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Jane Heath | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Whitehead | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Mustafa | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gerrie Serpell | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Murch | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE SLADDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE MCCULLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARNABY SWIRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUZIE ROSS-BROWNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP HARLAND | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.35k | £29.24k | £34.49k | £62.32k | £82.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.58k | £26.44k | £32.57k | £41.76k | £49.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 April 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 April 2022 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 19TH NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE CANTERBURY AREA
Area of benefit
CANTERBURY, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whiteacre Farm House
Whiteacre Lane
Waltham
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT4 5SR
- Phone:
- 07704267471
- Email:
- info@cobbes-meadow-rda.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window