Financial history P.A.L.M.S. ( PORTLAND STREET, ADRIAN LODGE, MILL SUPPORTERS )

Charity number: 1075587
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2007 31/05/2008 31/05/2009 31/05/2010 31/05/2011
Total gross income £10.71k £11.64k £5.14k £7.89k £5.51k
Total expenditure £11.31k £10.41k £8.77k £6.65k £7.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A