Financial history SON RISE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1076883
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £37.85k £37.81k £41.89k £21.66k £24.91k
Total expenditure £35.24k £31.30k £26.55k £22.10k £40.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A