Trustees KESTEVEN RIDEABILITY
Charity number: 1074079

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA WEBBER | Chair | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Gay Hatton | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Ashton | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Clare Brown | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Claire Honeywood | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Emily Johnson | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
KAREN THOMPSON | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILL SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.