SUGARLOAF GROUP OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enable disabled people to ride horses and ponies to help improve their lives through physical exercise and mental stimulation which is supported by volunteer helpers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 09 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
- Thurrock
Governance
- 23 February 1999: Standard registration
- 29 September 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 September 2015: Funds transferred to 1154445 SUGARLOAF RDA
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 09/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.38k | £24.14k | £27.78k | £37.47k | £25.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.00k | £23.36k | £22.82k | £20.31k | £16.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 09 March 2014 | 14 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
09 March 2014
(These accounts |
14 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 19 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 19 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 10 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 16 August 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE THURROCK AREA.
Area of benefit
THURROCK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window