Accounts and annual returns QUEST RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074057
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 24 February 2016 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 28 May 2015 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 02 February 2014 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 14 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required