Accounts and annual returns LOW ROW AND FEETHAM LITERARY INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1114074
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 11 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 05 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 19 December 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 01 December 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required