Financial history LOW ROW AND FEETHAM LITERARY INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1114074
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £5.08k £13.97k £12.25k £8.65k £36.57k
Total expenditure £2.51k £1.57k £3.58k £9.67k £64.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £8.10k N/A £27.01k