LOW ROW AND FEETHAM LITERARY INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain building & contents Organise Village Events Let out Hall to local residents, organisations, groups, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £27,009 from 1 government grant(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 08 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Ann Roberts | Chair | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Louise Roxburgh | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Betterton | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Gaynor Elizabeth Voice | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Neil Jackson | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Lewis | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CALVERT | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SILVER | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIA D D THOROGOOD | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND JAMES CALVERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN J THOROGOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARY CALVERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE EDWARD BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMAN JOSEPH SUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER KENNETH ROE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SIMON CALVERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAYMOND ALDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.08k | £13.97k | £12.25k | £8.65k | £36.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.51k | £1.57k | £3.58k | £9.67k | £64.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £8.10k | N/A | £27.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 December 2022 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 01 December 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 19 DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 4 MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE RICHMOND, NORTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Melbecks House
Low Row
RICHMOND
North Yorkshire
DL11 6NA
- Phone:
- 01748886524
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
none.none
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window