SALERS CATTLE SOCIETY OF THE UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1115115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of agriculture by the management, promotion and the improvement of the breeding of the Salers breed of livestock and the maintenance of the purity of the breed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £87,374
Total expenditure: £103,368

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SALER CATTLE SOCIETY OF THE UK LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TERENCE PYE Trustee 04 June 2017
None on record
Tom Walling Trustee 04 June 2017
None on record
KATHLEEN MARY LIVESEY Trustee 09 March 2012
None on record
Robert Neil Livesey Trustee 05 July 2006
None on record
ALAN HOWATSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £103.73k £104.17k £121.02k £98.65k £87.37k
Total expenditure £107.00k £87.27k £104.97k £115.79k £103.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 06 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lane Farm
Milnthorpe
LA7 7NH
Phone:
07903626249