THE YORK FOUNDATION FOR CONSERVATION AND CRAFTSMANSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting conservation of the national heritage, with particular emphasis on the training of craftsmen and conservators, especially within the Yorkshire Region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 April 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Louise Schaefer | Chair | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alaina Marie Schmisseur | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katharine Eve Harrison | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis William Downing | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Ruth Treece | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Barry Holton | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Griffiths | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Andrew Bryant | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gill Chitty FSA, IHBC | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Grierson | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.04k | £14.67k | £18.23k | £16.88k | £17.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.03k | £36.72k | £59.06k | £48.20k | £51.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 06 January 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
(1) TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE MATERIAL REMAINS OF THE PAST WHICH FORM PART OF, OR WHICH ENHANCE, THE CULTURAL, HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC HERITAGE OF THE NATION INCLUDING BUILDINGS, ARTEFACTS, GARDENS, WHETHER OF LOCAL VALUE TO THE CITY OF YORK AND ITS SURROUNDING REGION, OR TO THE NATION AS A WHOLE. (2) TO MAINTAIN ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE TRAINING, CONTINUING EDUCATION OR WORK EXPERIENCE OF PRACTITIONERS IN THE THEORY OF CONSERVATION AND IN THE TRADITION OR PRACTICAL SKILLS NECESSARY TO REPAIR RESTORE RENOVATE OR OTHERWISE PRESERVE THE BUILDINGS. ARTEFACTS ETC. WORTHY OF CONSERVATION REFERRED TO IN (1) ABOVE. (3) TO PROMOTE AND EXECUTE SPECIFIC PROJECTS AND RESEARCH RELATING TO ANY ASPECTS OF CONSERVATION REFERRED TO IN (1) ABOVE TO ENABLE BOTHE THE LOCAL AND NATIONAL CULTURAL HISTORIC AND ARTISTIC HERITAGE TO BE PRESERVED. (4) TO BENEFIT THE CITY OF YORK AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY BY (A) PROVIDING AND PROMOTING ACCESS FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO THE RESULTS OF ANY CONSERVATION PROJECTS OR RESEARCH PROMOTED OR SUPPORTED BY THE FOUNDATION. THROUGH PUBLICITY MATERIAL ARTICLES PAMPHLETS ETC., AND THROUGH EXHIBITIONS SEMINARS AND CONFERENCES ETC. TO DISSEMINATE AND TO FURTHER EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF CONSERVATION. (B) WORKING WITH SCHOOLS AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO STIMULATE AN INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR CONSERVATION WITHIN THE BROADER AIMS OF THE FOUNDATION.
Area of benefit
CITY OF YORK AND ITS SURROUNDING REGION, OR TO THE NATION AS A WHOLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MERCHANT ADVENTURERS HALL
FOSSGATE
YORK
YO1 9XD
- Phone:
- 07808479298
- Email:
- info@conservationyork.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window