Financial history ROUGH COMMON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity Number: 1073952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.86k £7.10k £8.79k £13.11k £16.33k
Total expenditure £14.01k £8.85k £6.34k £22.90k £17.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £3.17k N/A