ROUGH COMMON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities, buildings and space for (primarily local) groups such as pre-school playgroup, keep fit, dog training, artists, badminton and football and cricket.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 15 February 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH SAMUELSON | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SALVATORI | Trustee | 25 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.86k | £7.10k | £8.79k | £13.11k | £16.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.01k | £8.85k | £6.34k | £22.90k | £17.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.17k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 January 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 16 AUGUST 1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 9TH MARCH 2000. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/11/2015
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL, PLAYING FIELD AND FACILITIES ANCILLARY THERETO FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ROUGH COMMON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ROUGH COMMON, KENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Hillside Avenue
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT2 8ET
- Phone:
- 01227-472628
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window