HUNTS FARM GROUP RIDING FOR THE DIASABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Riding groups and lessons for disabled adults Group closing down - please advise process
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 February 1999: Standard registration
- 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEANNIE ALBERTA BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE RUTH FLETCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £446 | £116 | £180 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £395 | £420 | £592 | £370 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 30TH NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A REGISTERED CHARITY UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE CROWLE, WORCESTER AREA
Area of benefit
CROWLE, WORCESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodside
Sneads Green
Droitwich
WR9 0PY
- Phone:
- 01299851465
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window