WOOD GREEN ANIMAL SHELTER GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Wood Green Animal Shelter Group Riding for the Disabled Association is to provide the opportunity for riding to disabled people who might benefit in their general health and well-being in the Huntingdon area of the County of Cambridgeshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 24 February 1999: Standard registration
- 07 February 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 07 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1191398 WOOD GREEN RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INC...
- WGAS RDA (Working name)
- WOOD GREEN GROUP (Working name)
- WOOD GREEN RDA (Working name)
- WOOD GREEN RDA GROUP (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.39k | £14.95k | £3.42k | £1.82k | £3.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.84k | £6.26k | £6.31k | £7.93k | £10.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 25 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE HUNTINGDON AREA
Area of benefit
HUNTINGDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window