Accounts and annual returns PRIORS FIELD SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1074343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required