MARPOOL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a school PTA who raise funds which can then be donated to benefit the children of Marpool Primary School in Exmouth. Activities include Bingo, Jumble Sales, Discos, Christmas Market and Family Fun Night with Grand Prize Draws.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 18 February 1999: Standard registration
- M S A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULA LEANNE HARRIS | Chair | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Amy Rose Proctor | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Louise Wilson | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Emma Slater | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Maker | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Ann Evison | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Jones | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|||||
PAULA ANN WILLIAMS-BASSETT | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA JANE CHUBB | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DENISE KEYWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.66k | £5.46k | £18.26k | £33.22k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.35k | £6.43k | £21.36k | £5.95k | £12.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JANUARY 1999.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN EXMOUTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marpool Primary School
Moorfield Road
Exmouth
EX8 3QW
- Phone:
- 01395268654
- Email:
- Marpoolschoolmsa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window