CORE (CORE - CALVERTON, OASIS, RESOURCES, EDUCATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CORE is an essential one-stop shop in the village of Calverton, Nottingham offering information, advice and guidance, education and training, leisure courses and activities like Trace Your Ancestors, tutor-led Job Club, office services, book loan, stationery supplies, Hearing Clinic, meeting rooms, Citizens Advice Bureau, Chairbased Exercise and Yoga, Chiropody, Reflexology and Family Law Service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £14,780 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 16 March 2000: Standard registration
- THE CORE CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Norman Granville Lord | Chair | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wallis | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Baker | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Newlove | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Burrows | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA DOREEN BOSWORTH | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eva Atkin | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ADRIAN PECK | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.64k | £90.71k | £29.68k | £128.66k | £128.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.97k | £93.89k | £90.77k | £105.59k | £112.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £600 | £22.64k | £11.35k | £1.73k | £14.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED 20 APRIL 1999 AND AMENDED 20 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ANY SERVICES AND FACILITIES DEEMED IN LAW TO BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AMONGST PERSONS RESIDENT IN CALVERTON, WOODBOROUGH, OXTON, EPPERSTONE, GONALSTON, LOWDHAM AND OTHER NEARBY COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
CALVERTON, WOODBOROUGH, OXTON, EPPERSTONE, GONALSTON, LOWDHAM AND OTHER NEARBY COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
CALVERTON CORE CENTRE
At Calverton Working Men's Club
Collyer Road
NOTTINGHAM
NG14 6JX
- Phone:
- 01158470551
- Email:
- info@calvertoncore.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window