3GS DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are the main delivery organisation for the Welsh Assembly's Communities First Programme in the electoral wards of Gurnos and Penydarren in the County Borough of Merthyr Tydfil. Some of our priorities include delivering regeneration programmes in the area and helping the community to become more involved with the local service providers i.e. local health board, local authority, schools etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Merthyr Tydfil
Governance
- 23 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Davies | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee James Davies | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
RITA SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.27k | £131.00k | £21.35k | £14.77k | £8.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.85k | £510.00k | £29.24k | £35.32k | £13.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.00k | £13.50k | £1.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 October 2023 | 250 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 1999.
Charitable objects
PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN REGENERATION IN THE NEW GURNOS, THE OLD GURNOS AND THE GALON UCHAF ESTATES IN THE MERTHYR TYDFIL COUNTY BOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS:- A - THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. B - THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; C - THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; D - THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS; OR II) TO EXISTING BUSINESS. E - THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; F - THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; G - THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; H - THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE HERITAGE OF THE BENEFIT AREA AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND THE HERITAGE OF THE BENEFIT AREA AND OF BETTER WAYS OF CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; I - THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; J - THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE K - THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME L - SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
IN THE NEW AND OLD GURNOS AND THE GALON UCHAF ESTATES IN THE MERTHYR TYDFIL COUNTY BOROUGH, AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 G's Development Trust
15 Chestnut Way
MERTHYR TYDFIL
CF47 9SB
- Phone:
- 01685350888
- Email:
- reception@3gs.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window