Financial history DEVON AND CORNWALL COMMUNITY WATCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.81k £63.90k £85.38k £6.51k £950
Total expenditure £2.86k £31.80k £78.15k £19.81k £856
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £58.10k N/A N/A