RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION WAVERLEY DRIVING GROUP RDA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The group (all volunteers) normally owns two or three ponies and carriages which are used to give drives to physically and mentally handicapped adults and young people, many of whom live in residential homes or attend day centres. In normal times we are open for clients twice a week. If possible clients learn to drive a pony, others have a ride, all enjoy it and come weekly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 22 February 1999: Standard registration
- 17 June 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1137217 ELISABETH CURTIS CENTRE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED
- WAVERLEY DRIVING GROUP RDA (Working name)
- RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION WAVERLEY GROUP (Previous name)
- WAVERLEY GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.98k | £4.13k | £605 | £225 | £907 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.30k | £7.47k | £7.78k | £2.94k | £1.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 NOVEMBER 1998 as amended on 17 Mar 2015 as amended on 24 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE HERTFORDSHIRE AND BEDFORDSHIRE AREA
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window