ALPHA INDIA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief for orphaned and destitute children in the Indian sub continent including accomodation,food and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
- India
Governance
- 10 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jehoshaphat Prudent Williams | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Higgins | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY JOSEPH FERNAND | Trustee | 25 June 2011 |
|
|||||||
LESLEY CAROL MARGARET FERNAND | Trustee | 25 June 2011 |
|
|||||||
Alan Field | Trustee | 11 September 1998 |
|
|||||||
PAUL CHARLES DAWSON | Trustee | 11 September 1998 |
|
|
||||||
PEARL HIGGINS | Trustee | 11 September 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.30k | £44.02k | £38.46k | £38.54k | £32.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.50k | £33.14k | £37.85k | £33.25k | £33.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 JANUARY 1999
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") IN THE INDIAN SUB-CONTINENT ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") NAMELY FOR THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 18 WHO ARE ORPHANED OR ABANDONED OR REJECTED BY THEIR PARENTS AND WHO ARE OTHERWISE UNABLE BY THEIR OWN EFFORTS TO SUPPORT THEMSELVES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO CHILDREN WHO SUFFER FROM INCOMPLETE OR DEFORMED DEVELOPMENT OF BODY OR MIND.
Area of benefit
INDIAN SUB-CONTINENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Heathlands Avenue
West Parley
FERNDOWN
Dorset
BH22 8RW
- Phone:
- 01202690014
- Email:
- aif@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window